EP0308204 - Car telephone equipment having automatic calling function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.05.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inaba, Tsutomu c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Marui, Kuniyoshi c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1989/12] | Sturt, Clifford Mark MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308507.8 | 14.09.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | JP19870234432 | 18.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23443287 | [1989/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0308204 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0308204 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/04, H04M1/27 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
H04M1/2749 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1989/12] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug-Telefon-Einrichtung mit automatischer Ruf-Funktion | [1989/12] | English: | Car telephone equipment having automatic calling function | [1989/12] | French: | Equipement téléphonique de voiture avec une fonction d'appel automatique | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/12] | 25.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/26] | 06.04.1994 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.03.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/26] | Appeal following examination | 06.06.1994 | Appeal received No. T0772/94 | 08.08.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.08.1995 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1995/32] | 15.12.1995 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/50] | 20.03.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 20.03.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.03.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57065052 ; | [Y]DE3049049 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2530103 (THOMSON CSF MAT TEL [FR]); | [Y]DE3608497 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 140 (E-121)[1018], 29th July 1982; & JP-A-57 065 052 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.), & JP57065052 A 00000000 |