EP0314289 - Multiple pixel generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aranda, Michael Archangel 18 Willow Road Saugerties New York 12477 / US | 02 /
Ebbers, Timothy Jon 5 Onteora Court Shokan New York 12481 / US | 03 /
Iida, Yoshio Lake Katrine Apartments 10-C Lake Katrine New York 12449 / US | 04 /
Kindgren, Terence Wallace RD1, Box 120, Route 213 Rosendale New York 12472 / US | 05 /
Robertson, Taggart Huth RD1, Box 9, Potic Mountain Road Earlton New York 12058 / US | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Burt, Roger James, Dr., et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1989/43] | Johansson, Lars E. IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 4-01 S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1989/18] | Appleton, John Edward IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308652.2 | 19.09.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | US19870115451 | 30.10.1987 Original published format: US 115451 | [1989/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0314289 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0314289 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314289 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
G06T11/203 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/18] | G06F15/72 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/18] | Title | German: | Mehrbildelementgenerator | [1989/18] | English: | Multiple pixel generator | [1989/18] | French: | Générateur de pixels multiples | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/40] | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4115863 (BROWN RICHARD R) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 30, no. 3, August 1987, pages 964-965, Armonk, New York, US; "Line-drawing method using bit-blt on a bit-map memory". |