EP0359878 - Filter screen assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Wire Limited Granton Park Avenue Edinburgh EH5 1HT / GB | [1990/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Souter, George Lawrence 7 Johnston Gardens West Peterculter Aberdeen Scotland / GB | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Nash, Keith Wilfrid, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Nash, Keith Wilfrid, et al KEITH W. NASH & Co. Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308751.2 | 21.09.1988 | [1990/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0359878 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0359878 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/28 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
B01D29/012 (EP);
B01D29/52 (EP);
B01D29/96 (EP);
B01D2201/0415 (EP);
B01D2201/4084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1990/13] | Title | German: | Mehrfach-Filtersieb | [1990/13] | English: | Filter screen assembly | [1990/13] | French: | Assemblage de tamis de filtre | [1990/13] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 25.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2792906 ; | [A]DE2513101 ; | [A]DE8235215U ; | [A]DE3139279 | [A] - AUFBEREITUNGS-TECHNIK | Examination | - AUFBEREITUNGS-TECHNIK, no. 11, 1st November 1967, pages 646-656; K. WOLFF: "Siebböden aus Gummi und Chemiewerkstoffen" |