EP0310306 - Form-fill-seal machine for automatic production of sealed packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANFORD REDMOND INC. 780 East 134 Street Bronx New York 10454 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states SANFORD REDMOND INC. 780 East 134 Street Bronx New York 10454 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Redmond, Sanford 746 Riverbank Road,Stamford Connecticut 06903 / US | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Charlton, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1992/05] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1989/14] | Crawford, Fiona Merle Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308850.2 | 23.09.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | US19870101227 | 25.09.1987 Original published format: US 101227 | [1989/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0310306 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0310306 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/04, B65B57/04 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
B65B57/04 (EP,US);
B65B9/00 (KR);
B65B9/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Formen, Füllen und Siegeln für die automatische Herstellung von gesiegelten Verpackungen | [1989/14] | English: | Form-fill-seal machine for automatic production of sealed packages | [1989/14] | French: | Machine de formage, remplissage et scellage pour la fabrication automatique d'emballages scellés | [1989/14] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3343336 (BRADFORD KENNETH C); | [A]DE2056414 | Examination | US3673760 | US3874143 | US3979877 | US4349997 | FR2601330 |