EP0310312 - Non-nucleotide reagents for substituting termini of oligonucleotides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.L. TECHNOLOGY VENTURES, L.P. c/o Merrill Lynch R & D Management Inc. North Tower World Financial Center New York New York 10281-1201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states M.L. TECHNOLOGY VENTURES, L.P. c/o Merrill Lynch R & D Management Inc. North Tower World Financial Center New York New York 10281-1201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, Lyle John 5439 Noah Way San Diego California 92117 / US | 02 /
Bhatt, Ram Saroop 3575 San Toro Way San Diego California 92130 / US | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88308877.5 | 23.09.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | US19870104330 | 02.10.1987 Original published format: US 104330 | [1989/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0310312 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0310312 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/24, C07H21/04, C12Q1/68 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
C07F9/2408 (EP);
C07H21/00 (EP);
C12Q1/68 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/14] | Title | German: | Nichtnukleotide Reagenzien für Endsubstituierung von Oligonukleotiden | [1989/14] | English: | Non-nucleotide reagents for substituting termini of oligonucleotides | [1989/14] | French: | Réactifs non nucléotides pour substituer les extrémités d'oligonucléotides | [1989/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/51] | 31.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/39] | 29.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0233053 (APPLIED BIOSYSTEMS [US]); | [XP]US4757141 (FUNG STEVEN [US], et al); | [E]EP0292128 (TAMIR BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD [IL]) | [X] - JOURNAL OF GENERAL CHEMISTRY OF THE USSR, vol. 45, no. 10, part 2, October 1975, pages 2343-2344, Plenum Publishing Corporation, New York, US; L.I. MIZRAKH et al.: "Reactions of alkyl tetraalkylphophorodamidites with N-(2-hydroxyethyl)acetamide" | [A] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 13, 1985, pages 2399-2412, IRL PRess Limited, Oxford, GB; L.M. SMITH et al.: "The synthesis of oligonucleotides containing an aliphatic group at the 5' terminus: synthesis of fluorescent DNA primers for use in DNA sequences analysis |