EP0310385 - Filter plate, filter plate element, and filter comprising same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kopf, Henry B. 108, Coatbridge Circle Cary North Carolina 27511 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states Kopf, Henry B. 108, Coatbridge Circle Cary North Carolina 27511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/14] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1989/14] | Marchant, James Ian Elkington & Fife Beacon House 113 Kingsway London WC2B 6PP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309035.9 | 29.09.1988 | [1989/14] | Priority number, date | US19870104177 | 02.10.1987 Original published format: US 104177 | [1989/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0310385 | Date: | 05.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0310385 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/00, B01D29/00 | [1989/14] | CPC: |
B01D63/0822 (EP,US);
B01D25/215 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/14] | Title | German: | Filterplatte, Filterplattenelement und diese enthaltendes Filter | [1989/14] | English: | Filter plate, filter plate element, and filter comprising same | [1989/14] | French: | Plaque de filtration, élément de filtration sous forme de plaque, et filtre les comprenant | [1989/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/35] | 07.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2930986 (FIAT ENG); | [A]EP0036926 ; | [A]DD229603 (MEDIZIN LABORTECHNIK VEB K [DD]); | [A]WO8600237 (PERMUTIT BOBY LTD [GB]) |