EP0336038 - Apparatus for reproducing and processing picture information from a recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshio, Junichi c/o Pioneer Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-City Saitama / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Masami c/o Pioneer Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-City Saitama / JP | [1989/41] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309169.6 | 03.10.1988 | [1989/41] | Priority number, date | JP19880082619 | 04.04.1988 Original published format: JP 8261988 | [1989/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0336038 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0336038 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0336038 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/91 | [1989/41] | CPC: |
H04N1/3871 (EP,US);
H04N5/9208 (EP,US);
H04N9/802 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/41] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Wiedergabe und Verarbeitung von Bildinformation aus einem Aufzeichnungsträger | [1989/41] | English: | Apparatus for reproducing and processing picture information from a recording medium | [1989/41] | French: | Appareil pour reproduire et traiter de l'information d'image à partir d'un support d'enregistrement | [1989/41] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 01.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0193996 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]EP0242215 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0256295 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) | [Y] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, vol. COM-31, no. 2, February 1983, pages 245-250, IEEE, New York, US; R.D. GORDON: "An interactive video information terminal" | [A] - AUDIO, vol. 71, no. 3, March 1987, pages 26+28+30; K. POHLMANN: "Minding your P's and Q's" |