EP0312240 - Electric female connector piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 616-8025 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto 616 / JP | ||
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto 616 / JP | ||
Former [1989/16] | For all designated states OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO. 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shima, Koichi c/o Patent Department Omron Tateisi El. Co. 20, Igadera Shimo-kaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Tomizu, Motoyuki c/o Patent Department Omron Tateisi El. Co. 20, Igadera Shimo-kaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1989/16] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309256.1 | 05.10.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | JP19870156592 | 13.10.1987 Original published format: JP 15659287 | [1989/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0312240 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0312240 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/187 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
H01R13/187 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/16] | Title | German: | Elektrische Steckverbindungsbuchse | [1989/16] | English: | Electric female connector piece | [1989/16] | French: | Pièce de connexion électrique femelle | [1989/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 10.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/18] | 25.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1511887 (BERG ELECTRONICS BV); | [A]GB2048581 (AKZONA INC) | [A] - 21st Electronic Components Conference 12 May 1971, Washington D.C., USA, pages 226 - 232; P.E. Fitting: "The Advantages of Dual-Metal Components in a Miniature Interconnection System" |