EP0314338 - Method for measuring human insulin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746 / JP | ||
Former [1989/18] | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Oaza-Tonda Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi 746 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inouye, Kuniyo 37-17-402, Sagamiono 7-Chome Sagamihara-Shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Satoh, Kazuki 2193-1, Oaza Katayanagi Sakado-Shi Saitama / JP | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309546.5 | 12.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | JP19870254621 | 12.10.1987 Original published format: JP 25462187 | [1989/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314338 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314338 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/74, G01N33/577 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
C07K16/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung von humanen Insulin | [1989/18] | English: | Method for measuring human insulin | [1989/18] | French: | Méthode de mesure de l'insuline humaine | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 18.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE3411472 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 15, 14th October 1985, page 554, no. 121356z, Columbus, Ohio, US; M.J. STORCH et al.: "Recognition of human insulin and proinsulin by monoclonal antibodies", & DIABETES 1985, 34(8, Pt. 1), 808-11 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 11, 17th March 1986, page 511, no. 86756b, Columbus, Ohio, US; A. LIVNEH et al.: "A human monoclonal antibody to insulin", & DIABETES 1986, 35(1), 68-73 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 17, 22nd October 1984, page 534, no. 149476w, Columbus, Ohio, US; M. ZIEGLER et al.: "Monoclonal antibodies to human insulin and their antigen binding behavior", & BIOMED. BIOCHIM. ACTA 1984, 43(5), 695-701 | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF BIOTECH 83, London, 4th-6th May 1983, pages 823-832; D. LOW: "Purification of monoclonal antibodies and their use in the isolation of biological products" |