EP0313322 - Solid-state image sensor having a plurality of horizontal transfer portions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimata, Masafumi c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha LSI Kenkyusho 1 Mizuhara 4-chome Itami-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309794.1 | 19.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | JP19870264977 | 20.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26497787 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0313322 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0313322 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0313322 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/14, H04N3/15 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
H01L27/14831 (EP,US);
H04N25/713 (EP,US);
H04N25/73 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/17] | Title | German: | Halbleiterbildsensor mit mehrfachen horizontalen Transferabschnitten | [1989/17] | English: | Solid-state image sensor having a plurality of horizontal transfer portions | [1989/17] | French: | Dispositif de prise d'images à semi-conducteur ayant plusieurs portions de transfert horizontal | [1989/17] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 20.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0093411 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [Y]DE3439019 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [X]US4539596 (ELABD HAMMAM [US]); | [A]EP0213803 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [XP]EP0262665 (NEC CORP [JP]) |