EP0364636 - Modifield catalyst composition for polymerizing alpha-olefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsieh, John Tai-Tung 9 Ellsworth Drive Warren New Jersey 07060 / US | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Colmer, Stephen Gary Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 50-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | Colmer, Stephen Gary Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 50-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309829.5 | 19.10.1988 | [1990/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0364636 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/62 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F2410/01 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/025 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/24 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/17] | Title | German: | Modifizierte Katalysatorzusammensetzung zur Polymerisation von alpha-Olefinen | [1990/17] | English: | Modifield catalyst composition for polymerizing alpha-olefins | [1990/17] | French: | Composition de catalysateur modifiée à la polymérisation d'alpha-oléfines | [1990/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 16.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/26] | Request for further processing for: | 05.08.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.08.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB2023153 (BP CHEM INT LTD); | [Y]GB2073761 (BP CHEM INT LTD); | [A]EP0066204 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]); | [Y]EP0272553 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) |