EP0314390 - Semiconductor laser control circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1994 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.1995 [1995/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koishi, Kenji 3-4-38 Matsuodai Inagawa-cho Kawabe-gun Hyogo, 666-02 / JP | 02 /
Kubota, Shinji 46-1-406 Yamadaikehigashi-machi Hirakata Osaka, 573 / JP | 03 /
Ishibashi, Kenzo 1-212-1 Higashi-machi Moriguchi Osaka, 570 / JP | [1989/18] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/18] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309861.8 | 20.10.1988 | [1989/18] | Priority number, date | JP19870264461 | 20.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26446187 | JP19880125265 | 23.05.1988 Original published format: JP 12526588 | JP19880216560 | 31.08.1988 Original published format: JP 21656088 | [1989/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314390 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314390 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/133, G11B19/04, G11B7/125 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
G11B7/126 (EP,US);
G11B19/04 (EP,US);
H01S5/06835 (EP,US);
H01S5/06832 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/18] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Regelung eines Halbleiter-Lasers | [1989/18] | English: | Semiconductor laser control circuit | [1989/18] | French: | Circuit de réglage d'un laser à semi-conducteur | [1989/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 01.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6031323 ; | [A]US4237427 (HOLLAND JOHN M); | [A]GB2066557 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | [A]US4355395 (SALTER STUART R, et al); | [A]EP0169579 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 150 (E-324)[1873], 25th June 1985; & JP-A-60 31 323 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 18-02-1985, & JP6031323 A 00000000 |