EP0313390 - Gas sensor and method for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states OSAKA GAS CO., LTD 1 Hiranomachi 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka, 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states OSAKA GAS CO., LTD 1 Hiranomachi 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Toshimi c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ipponmatsu, Masamichi 8-31, Ohata-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88309925.1 | 21.10.1988 | [1989/17] | Priority number, date | JP19870267074 | 22.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26707487 | [1989/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0313390 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0313390 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/12, G01N27/16 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
G01N27/12 (EP,KR);
G01N27/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/17] | Title | German: | Gassensor und Herstellungsverfahren desselben | [1989/17] | English: | Gas sensor and method for production thereof | [1989/17] | French: | Capteur de gaz et son procédé de fabrication | [1989/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/17] | 08.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/20] | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4007435 (TIEN TSENG-YING); | [X]EP0141089 (CERBERUS AG [CH]); | [X]GB2085168 (ITT IND LTD); | [Y]EP0201936 (SEKISUI PLASTICS [JP]); | [Y]US4535315 (SAKAI SAI [JP]); | [A]US4453397 (OHTA MINORU [JP], et al); | [X]EP0059557 (DART IND INC [US]); | [XP]EP0265834 (FIGARO ENG [JP]) |