EP0315353 - Medium refractive index glass suitable for ophthalmic applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORNING GLASS WORKS Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states Corning Glass Works Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | ||
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states Corning Glass Works Sullivan Park FR-212 Corning New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boudot, Jean Emile 2 rue DuHaut Changis Tour Beau-Site Avon / FR | 02 /
Mazeau, Jean-Pierre 50 voie de la Liberte Samoreau Avon / FR | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310007.5 | 25.10.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | FR19870015278 | 04.11.1987 Original published format: FR 8715278 | US19880210427 | 23.06.1988 Original published format: US 210427 | [1989/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0315353 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315353 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/093 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
C03C3/093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1989/19] | Title | German: | Glas von mittlerem Brechungsindex, anwendbar in ophthalmischen Anwendungen | [1989/19] | English: | Medium refractive index glass suitable for ophthalmic applications | [1989/19] | French: | Verres d'indice de réfraction moyen convenant à des applications ophtalmologiques | [1989/19] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2550187 ; | [X]FR2540857 ; | [A]BE551389 ; | [A]GB2165231 |