EP0365723 - Fluidized bed reactor having an integrated recycle heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION Law Department Perryville Corporate Park Clinton New Jersey 08809-4000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION Law Department Perryville Corporate Park Clinton New Jersey 08809-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Walter Robert, Jr. 1659 Porter Road Union, New Jersey 07083 / US | 02 /
Sisson, Benjamin Hawes 267 Powder Horn Drive Phillipsburg, New Jersey 08865 / US | 03 /
Alliston, Michael Gerard 24 Field Lane Denville, New Jersey 07834 / US | [1993/17] |
Former [1990/18] | 01 /
Campbell, Walter Robert, Jr 1659 Porter Road Union, New Jersey 07083 / US | ||
02 /
Sisson, Benjamin Hawes 267 Powder Horn Drive Phillipsburg, New Jersey 08865 / US | |||
03 /
Alliston, Michael Gerard 24 Field Lane Denfield, New Jersey 07834 / US | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310030.7 | 25.10.1988 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0365723 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0365723 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F22B31/00, F23C11/02, B01J8/38 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
F22B31/0084 (EP,US);
F28D13/00 (EP,US);
F23C2206/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GB, IT [1990/18] | Title | German: | Wirbelschichtreaktor mit integriertem Rückführungswärmeaustauscher | [1990/18] | English: | Fluidized bed reactor having an integrated recycle heat exchanger | [1990/18] | French: | Réacteur à lit fluidisé comportant un échangeur de chaleur intégré de recyclage | [1990/18] | Examination procedure | 01.11.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 06.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0206066 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]); | [A]US4745884 (COULTHARD E JAMES [US]) |