EP0315372 - Digital signal recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.1993 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odaka, Kentaro c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310123.0 | 27.10.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | JP19870276931 | 31.10.1987 Original published format: JP 27693187 | [1989/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0315372 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0315372 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B20/18, H04N5/92, H04N5/782 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
G11B20/1809 (EP,US);
G11B5/09 (KR);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
H04N5/928 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/19] | G11B20/10, G11B20/18, H04N5/782 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsgerät für digitale Signale | [1989/19] | English: | Digital signal recording apparatus | [1989/19] | French: | Appareil pour enregister des signaux numériques | [1989/19] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/20] | 17.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0239326 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]); | [A]EP0222386 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4660103 (WILKINSON JAMES H [GB], et al); | [XP]US4772959 (AMANO YOSHINORI [JP], et al); | [XP]EP0276809 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) |