EP0316122 - Die assembly exchanging apparatus for extruder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yano, Eiji Technical Center Bridgestone Corp. 1-1, Ogawahigashi-Cho 3-Chome Kodaira City Tokyo / JP | [1989/20] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310438.2 | 07.11.1988 | [1989/20] | Priority number, date | JP19870285967 | 12.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28596787 | [1989/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0316122 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0316122 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0316122 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/08 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
B21C23/214 (EP,US);
B29C48/256 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/20] | Title | German: | Düsen-Wechselvorrichtung für Extruder | [1989/20] | English: | Die assembly exchanging apparatus for extruder | [1989/20] | French: | Dispositif d'échange des filières pour une extrudeuse | [1989/20] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 12.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57187222 ; | [A]JP59124823 ; | [A]JP5670925 ; | [AD]JP6144618 ; | [A]GB2083401 (FARREL BRIDGE LTD); | [Y]US4597709 (YONEZAWA KEITARO [JP]); | [Y]US4652410 (INOUE SEIZABURO [US], et al); | [XP]FR2601619 (SWISSCAB E A SCHOEN SA [CH]) | [A] - CAOUTCHOUCS & PLASTIQUES, vol. 62, no. 650, April 1985, pages 82-83, Paris, FR; "Metalmeccanica plast: le changement de moule n'est plus un problème" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 31 (M-192)[1176], 8th February 1983; & JP-A-57 187 222 (NIPPON SEIKOSHO K.K.) 17-11-1982, & JP57187222 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 249 (M-338)[1686], 15th November 1984; & JP-A-59 124 823 (NIIGATA TEKKOSHO K.K.) 19-07-1984, & JP59124823 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 135 (M-85)[807], 27th August 1981; & JP-A-56 70 925 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 13-06-1981, & JP5670925 A 00000000 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 204 (M-499)[2260] , 17th July 1986; & JP-A-61 44 618 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD) 04-03-1986, & JP6144618 A 00000000 |