EP0316132 - Steam generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLOWER ENGINEERING INC. 91 Fernstaff Court Concord Ontario L4K 4L0 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | For all designated states BLOWER ENGINEERING INC. 91 Fernstaff Court Concord Ontario L4K 4L0 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Byrnes, Thomas S. P.O. Box 1082 King City Ontario LOG 1KO / CA | [1989/20] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310476.2 | 08.11.1988 | [1989/20] | Priority number, date | US19870120011 | 12.11.1987 Original published format: US 120011 | [1989/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0316132 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0316132 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F22B1/26 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
F22B1/26 (EP);
F22B27/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/20] | Title | German: | Dampferzeuger | [1989/20] | English: | Steam generator | [1989/20] | French: | Générateur de vapeur | [1989/20] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 31.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/41] | 24.05.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE256576 ; | [X]GB333922 (GEORGE ROLFE STOW, et al); | [A]US4288978 (WYATT WILLIAM G); | [A]FR2016137 (INST VOOR BEWARING); | [A]BE555026 ; | [A]FR716929 |