EP0316154 - Silicon-containing polyimide precursor, cured product therefrom, and preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chisso Corporation 6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0055 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | For all designated states Chisso Corporation 6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunimune, Koichi 12-2, Ichihara Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Kato, Haruo 10-1, Otsutomo-cho Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kutsuzawa, Yoshiya 10-2, Otsutomo-cho Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/20] | Representative(s) | Lamb, John Baxter, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | Lamb, John Baxter, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310548.8 | 09.11.1988 | [1989/20] | Priority number, date | JP19870283728 | 10.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28372887 | JP19870285050 | 11.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28505087 | [1989/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0316154 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0316154 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0316154 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
C08G73/10 (KR);
C08G73/106 (EP,US);
C08G77/455 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1989/20] | Title | German: | Silizium enthaltendes Polyimid-Prepolymer, davon abgeleitete ausgehärtete Produkte und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1989/20] | English: | Silicon-containing polyimide precursor, cured product therefrom, and preparation thereof | [1989/20] | French: | Précurseur de polyimide contenant de la silice, produit réticulé le contenant, sa méthode de préparation | [1989/20] | Examination procedure | 02.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 11.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0216007 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US4609700 (KUNIMUNE KOUICHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0208396 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) |