EP0317236 - Data acquisition system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Wilsonville Industrial Park 26600 S.W. Parkway Avenue Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Wilsonville Industrial Park, 26600 S.W. Parkway Avenue Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | ||
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states ANALYTEK LTD 10261 Bubb Road Cupertino California / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsen, Raymond S. 161 North Balsamini Way Menlo Park California 94025 / US | 02 /
Walker, James Terrell 224 Seale Avenue Palo Alto California 94306 / US | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1989/21] | Wayte, Dennis Travers BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88310724.5 | 14.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | US19870120669 | 16.11.1987 Original published format: US 120669 | [1989/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0317236 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0317236 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317236 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11C27/02 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
G11C27/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/21] | Title | German: | Datenerfassungssystem | [1989/21] | English: | Data acquisition system | [1989/21] | French: | Système d'acquisition de données | [1989/21] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.1992 | 30.11.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.02.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.02.1994 | CH | 16.02.1994 | IT | 16.02.1994 | LI | 16.02.1994 | NL | 16.02.1994 | SE | 16.02.1994 | [1999/42] |
Former [1995/10] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
CH | 16.02.1994 | ||
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
NL | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/47] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
CH | 16.02.1994 | ||
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 16.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3714623 (MICKLER B); | [A]US4627027 (RAI YASUKI [JP], et al) | Examination | EP0157607 |