EP0318234 - Improvements in or relating to selective serotonin uptake inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robertson, David Wayne 4290 Hunters Ridge Lane Greenwood Indiana 46142 / US | 02 /
Wong, David Taiwai 1640 Ridge Hill Lane Indianapolis Indiana 46217 / US | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311015.7 | 22.11.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | US19870125110 | 25.11.1987 Original published format: US 125110 | [1989/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0318234 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0318234 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318234 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/38, C07C217/72, A61K31/135 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/22] | C07C87/28, C07C93/14, A61K31/135 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/22] | Title | German: | Selektive Sertonin-Aufnahme-Inhibitoren | [1989/22] | English: | Improvements in or relating to selective serotonin uptake inhibitors | [1989/22] | French: | Inhibiteurs sélectifs d'assimilation de sérotonine | [1989/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 12.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR8291M ; | [A]GB1218135 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [AD]US4314081 (MOLLOY BRYAN B, et al); | [A]EP0100257 (DELALANDE SA [FR]) |