EP0318325 - Resin composition for artificial marble [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | ||
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Kagaku Kogyo Co., Ltd 1, 5-chome, Koraibashi Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yukawa, Nobuhiko 1008-4, Matsukage Okubo-cho Akashi-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Terukuni 29-3, Yamamichi Minamino-aza Itami-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Sakamoto, Katsuhiko 3-35, Harukiizumi-cho Kishiwada-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Motoyama, Atsushi 4-52, Nakanoshima-cho Suita-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311222.9 | 25.11.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | JP19870296046 | 26.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29604687 | JP19880185574 | 27.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18557488 | JP19880204732 | 19.08.1988 Original published format: JP 20473288 | [1989/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0318325 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0318325 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318325 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, C08L57/00, C08F283/10 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
C08G59/42 (EP);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C04B26/04 (EP);
C04B26/14 (EP);
C08F283/10 (EP);
C04B2111/545 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B26/04, C04B14/303, C04B24/04, C04B24/281, C04B40/02 (EP);
C04B26/14, C04B14/303, C04B24/04, C04B24/26, C04B40/02 (EP);
C08K3/013, C08L51/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/22] | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung für Kunstmarmor | [1989/22] | English: | Resin composition for artificial marble | [1989/22] | French: | Composition de résine pour marbre artificiel | [1989/22] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 06.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.03.1994 | IT | 16.03.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 16.03.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU365341 ; | [A]FR2389645 (ROHM & HAAS [US]); | [A]EP0025178 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 78, no. 13, 2nd July 1973, page 244, abstract no. 163422p, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-365 341 (ALL-UNION SCIENTIFIC-RESEARCH AND DESIGN INSTITUTE "TEPLOPROEKT") 08-01-1973, & SU365341 A 00000000 |