EP0320158 - Integrated process for the conversion of methanol to gasoline and distillate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harandi, Mohsen Nadimi 12 Catbird Court Lawrenceville New Jersey 08648 / US | 02 /
Owen, Hartley 5 Riverview Terrace Belle Mead New Jersey 08502 / US | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Colmer, Stephen Gary Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | Colmer, Stephen Gary European Office of Patent Counsel Mobil House 500-600 Witan Gate Central Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire MK9 1ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311266.6 | 28.11.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | US19870130256 | 08.12.1987 Original published format: US 130256 | [1989/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0320158 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/02 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
C10L1/023 (EP,US);
C07C2/12 (EP,US);
C07C41/06 (EP,US);
C07C2529/40 (EP,US);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/06, C07C43/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/24] | Title | German: | Integriertes Umwandlungsverfahren für Methanol zu Benzin und Destillat | [1989/24] | English: | Integrated process for the conversion of methanol to gasoline and distillate | [1989/24] | French: | Procédé intégré de conversion du méthanol en essence et en distillat | [1989/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 30.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0190816 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]); | [A]FR2593513 (LABOFINA SA [BE]) |