EP0322135 - Materials for and manufacture of fire and heat resistant components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROMPTON DESIGN MANUFACTURING LIMITED 16 Lord Street Southport Merseyside, PR8 1QD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states CROMPTON DESIGN MANUFACTURING LIMITED 16 Lord Street Southport Merseyside, PR8 1QD / GB | ||
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states Crompton, Geoffrey 16 Lord Street Southport Merseyside PR8 1QD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crompton, Geoffrey 16 Lord Street Southport Merseyside PR8 1QD / GB | [1991/23] |
Former [1989/26] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [1989/26] | Lyons, Andrew John ROYSTONS Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311509.9 | 05.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | GB19870029303 | 16.12.1987 Original published format: GB 8729303 | [1989/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0322135 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09K21/14, C08K7/24, C08K3/00, C08L61/04, C04B28/26, C04B26/12, // (C04B28/26, 14:22, 38:08),(C04B26/12, 14:22, 38:08) | [1989/26] | CPC: |
C09K21/14 (EP,US);
C04B26/122 (EP,US);
C04B28/26 (EP,US);
C08K7/24 (EP,US);
C04B2111/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31833 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B26/122, C04B14/106, C04B14/22, C04B14/303, C04B22/0013, C04B38/08 (US,EP);
C04B26/122, C04B14/106, C04B14/22, C04B22/0013, C04B22/10, C04B38/08 (US,EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/106, C04B14/22, C04B14/303, C04B22/0013, C04B38/08 (EP,US);
C04B28/26, C04B14/106, C04B14/22, C04B22/0013, C04B22/10, C04B38/08 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/26] | Title | German: | Werkstoff für feuer- und hitzebeständige Teile und ihre Herstellung | [1989/26] | English: | Materials for and manufacture of fire and heat resistant components | [1989/26] | French: | Matériaux pour des composants résistant au feu et à la chaleur et leur fabrication | [1989/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 03.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/14] | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2081246 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [A]DE3534706 (KRAMER GMBH & CO KG HANS [DE]); | [XP]EP0287293 (CROMPTON GEOFFREY) |