EP0320241 - Magnetic recording medium and process for preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell Ltd. No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1989/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitakami, Osamu 20-2 Kubogaoka-4-chome Moriyamachi Kitasoma-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Fujiwara, Hideo 2-24-9, Keyakidai Moriyamachi Kitasoma-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Ogawa, Yoichi Mezon Atago B-203 744-2, Noda Noda-shi / JP | 04 /
Daimon, Hideo 2-2-202, Togashira-1-chome Toride-shi / JP | 05 /
Ichijo, Minoru 14-8, Kubogaoka-4-chome Moriyamachi Kitasoma-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311594.1 | 07.12.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | JP19870309329 | 07.12.1987 Original published format: JP 30932987 | JP19880039810 | 23.02.1988 Original published format: JP 3981088 | [1989/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0320241 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0320241 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/72, G11B5/84, G11B5/71 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
G11B5/84 (EP);
G11B5/7262 (EP,US);
G11B5/7257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, NL [1989/24] | Title | German: | Magnetischer Aufzeichnungsträger und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1989/24] | English: | Magnetic recording medium and process for preparing the same | [1989/24] | French: | Support d'enregistrement magnétique et son procédé de fabrication | [1989/24] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 01.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/31] | 11.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58085930 ; | [A]JP58085928 ; | [A]JP58085927 ; | [AP]JP62246137 ; | [X]JP62066417 ; | [X]JP61104328 ; | DE3000583 [ ] (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | EP0165649 [ ] (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]); | EP0165650 [ ] (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]); | DE3539380 [ ] (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | EP0240963 [ ] (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, Vol. MAG-21, No. 5, September 1985, pages 1533-1535; P. BUTTAFAVA et al.: "Lubrication and Wear Problems of Per-pendicular Recording Thin Film Flexible Media", page 1533, column 2. | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 184 (P-216)(1329), 13 August 1983; & JP-A-58 085 930 (HITACHI MAXELL K.K.) 23.05.1983., & JP58085930 A 19830813 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 184 (P-216)(1329), 13 August 1983; & JP-A-58 085 928 (HITACHI MAXELL K.K.) 23.05.1983., & JP58085928 A 19830813 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 184 (P-216)(1329), 13 August 1983; & JP-A-58 085 927 (HITACHI MAXELL K.K.) 23.05.1983., & JP58085927 A 19830813 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 12, No. 123 (P-690)(2970), 16 April 1988; & JP-A-62 246 137 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) 27.10.1987., & JP62246137 A 19880416 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, DATABASE JAPS/JPO, Vol. 11, No. 26 (P-609), 25 August 1987; & JP-A-62 066 417 (NEC CORP.) 25.03.1987., & JP62066417 A 19870825 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, DATABASE JAPS/JPO, Vol. 10, No. 284 (P-501), 26 September 1986; & JP-A-61 104 328 (NEC CORP.) 22-05-1986., & JP61104328 A 19860926 |