EP0322152 - A crate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states South African Polymer Holdings (Proprietary) Limited Spanner Road Clayville Transvaal Province / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states South African Polymer Holdings (Proprietary) Limited Spanner Road Clayville Transvaal Province / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Warwick, Michael James 6 Galeniet Street Jukskei Park Randburg Transvaal Province / ZA | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Hulse, Thomas Arnold, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Hulse, Thomas Arnold, et al Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311815.0 | 14.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | ZA19870009569 | 21.12.1987 Original published format: ZA 879569 | [1989/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0322152 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0322152 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322152 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/24 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
B65D1/243 (EP);
B65D25/10 (EP);
B65D2501/24082 (EP);
B65D2501/2414 (EP);
B65D2501/24152 (EP);
B65D2501/24216 (EP);
B65D2501/24261 (EP);
B65D2501/24273 (EP);
B65D2501/24337 (EP);
B65D2501/2435 (EP);
B65D2501/24541 (EP);
B65D2501/24802 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/26] | Title | German: | Kasten | [1989/26] | English: | A crate | [1989/26] | French: | Caisse | [1989/26] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1342806 (NEDERLANDSE APPL SCIENT RES); | [X]GB1373115 (STROMBERG & CO AS SVEIN); | [A]DE2903163 (WAVIN BV) |