EP0321232 - Disposable absorbent article with combination mechanical and adhesive tape fastener system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scripps, Charles Locke 11320 Watertown Plank Road Wauwatosa, WI 53226 / US | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Bottema, Johan Jan, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Bottema, Johan Jan, et al Procter & Gamble GmbH Patent Department Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 D-65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [1989/25] | Gibson, Tony Nicholas Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311862.2 | 15.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | US19870134278 | 17.12.1987 Original published format: US 134278 | [1989/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0321232 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0321232 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1993/21] | CPC: |
A61F13/581 (EP);
A61F13/58 (KR);
A61F13/15 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1989/25] | A41B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/25] | Title | German: | Haft- und Klebebandverschluss für saugfähige Artikel | [1989/25] | English: | Disposable absorbent article with combination mechanical and adhesive tape fastener system | [1989/25] | French: | Article absorbant comportant un système de fermeture à propriété adhésive et mécanique | [1989/25] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 20.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Request for further processing for: | 08.04.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2504210 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO); | [A]US4014340 (CHESLOW ERNEST); | [A]US4585450 (ROSCH PAULETTE M [US], et al); | [A]EP0235014 (BEGHIN SAY SA [FR]) |