EP0321236 - Production of composite resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746 / JP | ||
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Oaza-Tonda Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi 746 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuruta, Akeharu 5-1, Betsumei 3-Chome Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawaguchi, Hisato 4-1, Betsumei 3-Chome Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP | 03 /
Ishikawa, Tomohiro 8-20, Betsumei 6-Chome Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP | 04 /
Kondo, Yozo 1473-210, Miyakigaoka 2-Chome Yokkaichi-shi Mie-ken / JP | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88311866.3 | 15.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | JP19870316115 | 16.12.1987 Original published format: JP 31611587 | [1989/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0321236 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0321236 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0321236 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C08L81/06, C08J3/00, // (C08L81/06, 67:00) | [1989/25] | CPC: |
C08L81/06 (EP,US);
C08J5/00 (EP,KR,US);
B29C67/24 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0079 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L101/00, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L81/06, C08L2666/18 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/25] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Verbundwerkstoffen | [1989/25] | English: | Production of composite resins | [1989/25] | French: | Préparation de résines composites | [1989/25] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 21.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.11.1994 | IT | 30.11.1994 | NL | 30.11.1994 | GB | 28.02.1995 | DE | 01.03.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.11.1994 | |
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
GB | 28.02.1995 | ||
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
FR | 28.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | NL | 30.11.1994 | |
GB | 28.02.1995 | ||
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
FR | 28.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | NL | 30.11.1994 | |
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
FR | 28.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | NL | 30.11.1994 | |
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | DE | 01.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60147467 ; | [A]EP0041327 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [X]EP0071968 (ALLIED CORP [US]); | [A]US4614784 (KOZAKIEWICZ JOSEPH J [US]); | [XP]EP0291323 (UNIV AKRON [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 309 (C-318)[2032], 5th December 1985; & JP-A-60 147 467 (MITSUI TOATSU KAGAKU K.K.) 03-08-1985, & JP60147467 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0217563 |