EP0323103 - Multilayer ceramics coatings from the ceramification of hydrogen silsesquioxane resin in the presence of ammonia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | ||
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haluska, Loren Andrew 4519 James Drive Midland Michigan / US | 02 /
Michael, Keith Winton 2715 Siebert Road Midland Michigan / US | 03 /
Tarhay, Leo 2482 W. River Road Sanford Michigan / US | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88312027.1 | 19.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | US19870138743 | 28.12.1987 Original published format: US 138743 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323103 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323103 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323103 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/312, H01L21/314, H01L21/318, H01L21/324, C04B41/52 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
H01L23/5329 (EP,US);
H01L21/02282 (EP,US);
H01L21/0214 (EP,US);
H01L21/02216 (EP,US);
H01L21/02255 (EP,US);
H01L21/314 (US);
H01L21/3144 (US);
H01L21/02126 (EP);
H01L21/02167 (EP,US);
H01L21/0217 (EP,US);
H01L21/022 (EP,US);
H01L21/02271 (EP,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,US);
H01L21/02304 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/27] | H01L21/314, H01L21/318, H01L21/324 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/27] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige keramische Überzüge, hergestellt durch Keramifizierung von Wasserstoff-Silsesquioxan-Harz bei Anwesenheit von Ammoniak | [1989/27] | English: | Multilayer ceramics coatings from the ceramification of hydrogen silsesquioxane resin in the presence of ammonia | [1989/27] | French: | Revêtements multicouches en céramique obtenus par céramification de résine hydrogène silsesquioxane en présence d'ammoniaque | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 01.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 14.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0076656 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4395438 (CHIANG PING-WANG); | [A]GB2125423 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | [A]US4532150 (ENDO MORINOBU [JP], et al); | [AP]EP0270369 (DOW CORNING [US]); | [AP]EP0270229 (DOW CORNING [US]) | Examination | EP0270220 |