EP0323149 - Vectors and compounds for expression of zymogen forms of human protein C [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bang, Nils Ulrik 706 East 71st Street Indianapolis Indiana 46220 / US | 02 /
Ehrlich, Hartmut Josef Badhoevelaan 65 NL-1171 DB Badhoevedorp / NL | 03 /
Grinnell, Brian William 5038 Haynes Court Indianapolis Indiana 46250 / US | 04 /
Yan, Sau-Chi Betty 8131 Menlo Court East Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46240 / US | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88312201.2 | 22.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | US19870138009 | 28.12.1987 Original published format: US 138009 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323149 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323149 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323149 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/57, C12N9/64, A61K37/54, C12N5/10 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
C12N9/6464 (EP);
C12N15/00 (KR);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C12Y304/21069 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/27] | C12N15/00, C12N9/64, A61K37/54, C12N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Vektoren und Verbindungen zur Expression von Zymogen-Formen von menschlichem Protein C | [1989/27] | English: | Vectors and compounds for expression of zymogen forms of human protein C | [1989/27] | French: | Vecteurs et composés pour l'expression de formes zymogéniques de protéine C | [1989/27] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 04.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0191606 [ ] (LILLY CO ELI [US]) |