EP0323163 - Shift-feel Durability enhancement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES, INC. 20 South Fourth Street St. Louis Missouri 63102-1886 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES, INC. 20 South Fourth Street St. Louis Missouri 63102-1886 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Papay, Andrew George 897 Rustic Manor Circle Manchester Missouri 63011 / US | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Collier, Jeremy Austin Grey, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1989/27] | Application number, filing date | 88312229.3 | 22.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | US19870138332 | 28.12.1987 Original published format: US 138332 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0323163 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323163 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C10M133/06, // (C10M133/06, 133:06, 133:08), C10N30:06, C10N40:04 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
C10M133/06 (EP,US);
C10M133/08 (EP);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/042 (EP,US);
C10N2040/044 (EP,US);
C10N2040/046 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/251 (EP,US);
C10N2040/252 (EP,US);
C10N2040/253 (EP,US);
C10N2040/255 (EP,US);
C10N2040/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M133/06, C10M133/06 (EP,US);
C10M133/06, C10M133/08 (US,EP);
C10M2215/04, C10M2215/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Verbesserung der Dauerhaftigkeit der Schockreduktion bei Geschwindigkeitsänderung | [1989/27] | English: | Shift-feel Durability enhancement | [1989/27] | French: | Durabilité de la réduction de l'effet de choc lors du changement de vitesse | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.05.1991 | CH | 29.05.1991 | GR | 29.05.1991 | LI | 29.05.1991 | NL | 29.05.1991 | SE | 29.05.1991 | LU | 31.12.1991 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 29.05.1991 | |
CH | 29.05.1991 | ||
LI | 29.05.1991 | ||
NL | 29.05.1991 | ||
SE | 29.05.1991 | ||
LU | 31.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/06] | AT | 29.05.1991 | |
CH | 29.05.1991 | ||
LI | 29.05.1991 | ||
NL | 29.05.1991 | ||
SE | 29.05.1991 | ||
Former [1992/05] | AT | 29.05.1991 | |
NL | 29.05.1991 | ||
SE | 29.05.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | AT | 29.05.1991 | |
SE | 29.05.1991 | ||
Former [1991/51] | SE | 29.05.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2758086 (STUART FRANK A, et al); | [A]FR1148083 (WAKEFIELD & CO LTD C C); | [A]US4231883 (MALEC ROBERT E); | [A]EP0028789 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0032415 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) |