EP0323183 - Integrated circuit with photo sensor cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawahara, Yukito SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 31-1 Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Machida, Satoshi SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 31-1 Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Mukainakano, Hiroshi SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 31-1 Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Higashi, Masato SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 31-1 Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | ||
Former [1991/34] | Miller, Joseph J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | ||
Former [1989/27] | Caro, William Egerton J. MILLER & CO. Lincoln House 296-302 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88312284.8 | 23.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | JP19870332504 | 29.12.1987 Original published format: JP 33250487 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323183 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323183 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L49/02, H01L27/14, H04N1/028, G06K9/26 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
H04N1/02463 (EP,US);
H01L27/14643 (EP,US);
H04N1/024 (EP,US);
H04N1/207 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/31] | H01L49/02, G06K9/26, H04N1/028, G06K9/26 | ||
Former IPC [1989/27] | H01L27/14, G06K9/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/27] | Title | German: | Integrierte Schaltung mit photoempfindlichen Zellen | [1989/27] | English: | Integrated circuit with photo sensor cells | [1989/27] | French: | Circuit intégré avec des cellules photosensibles | [1989/27] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/52] | 04.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1994 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3339256 (CANON KK [JP]); | [Y]EP0246481 (HEIMANN GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4636813 (MEGO KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) | [A] - IRE WESCON CONVENTION RECORD. vol. 29, no. 11/1, November 85, NORTH HOLLYWOOD US pages 1 - 11; Y.Nishiguchi: "Development of thinfilm high speed thermal head for line printing" |