EP0278795 - Firearm percussion device for firing cartridges of two different calibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA MANURHIN DEFENSE 21, avenue Louis Bréguet 78145 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states MATRA MANURHIN DEFENSE 21, avenue Louis Bréguet F-78145 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beltzer, Jean 14 rue de l'Epée F-68460 Lutterbach / FR | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400023.3 | 06.01.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | FR19870000158 | 09.01.1987 Original published format: FR 8700158 | [1988/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0278795 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278795 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F41A19/13 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
F41A19/13 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/33] | F41D11/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | Schlagbolzenanordnung für Feuerwaffen zum Zünden zweier Patronen verschiedenen Kalibers | [1991/15] | English: | Firearm percussion device for firing cartridges of two different calibres | [1988/33] | French: | Dispositif de percussion pour arme à feu, permettant de s'adapter à deux munitions de calibres différents | [1988/33] |
Former [1988/33] | Schlagbolzenanordnung für Feuerwaffen zum Zünden zweier Kartuschen verschiedenen Kalibers | Examination procedure | 24.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.04.1991 | ES | 10.04.1991 | GB | 10.04.1991 | GR | 10.04.1991 | IT | 10.04.1991 | NL | 10.04.1991 | SE | 10.04.1991 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 10.04.1991 | |
GB | 10.04.1991 | ||
GR | 10.04.1991 | ||
IT | 10.04.1991 | ||
NL | 10.04.1991 | ||
SE | 10.04.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.04.1991 | |
GB | 10.04.1991 | ||
IT | 10.04.1991 | ||
NL | 10.04.1991 | ||
SE | 10.04.1991 | ||
Former [1992/06] | AT | 10.04.1991 | |
GB | 10.04.1991 | ||
NL | 10.04.1991 | ||
SE | 10.04.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | AT | 10.04.1991 | |
NL | 10.04.1991 | ||
SE | 10.04.1991 | ||
Former [1991/48] | SE | 10.04.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE298815 ; | [AD]US1373888 (JOHNSON THOMAS C); | [YD]DE518372 (SIMSON & CO); | [YD]US1849982 (HOWLAND HARRY E); | [YD]US2127318 (YOUNG CHARLES A); | [YD]US3049977 (REICH ROBERT J); | [YD]US3050894 (IVY JESSIE T); | [YD]US3170261 (LUIGI LUDOVICI); | [AD]CH534854 (HECKLER & KOCH GMBH [DE]) |