EP0277854 - Memory card manufacturing process and cards obtained by this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean Jaurès F-92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brignet, Marc 15, Avenue Laumière F-75019 Paris / FR | 02 /
Droche, Emile 10, rue Alsace Lorraine F-92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/05] | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1988/32] | Dronne, Guy SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean Jaurès F-92120 Montrouge / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400068.8 | 14.01.1988 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | FR19870000446 | 16.01.1987 Original published format: FR 8700446 | [1988/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277854 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277854 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06, H01L21/56 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
G06K19/07724 (EP);
G06K19/00 (KR);
B29C45/14647 (EP);
B60R21/00 (KR);
G06K19/07745 (EP);
H01L21/565 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/48465 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L2924/01057 (EP);
H01L2924/01079 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/32] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für Speicherkarten und durch dieses Verfahren erhaltene Karten | [1988/32] | English: | Memory card manufacturing process and cards obtained by this process | [1988/32] | French: | Procédé de réalisation de cartes à mémoire et cartes obtenues par la mise en oeuvre dudit procédé | [1988/32] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 06.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
14.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | 02
04.01.1993
03.03.1993
ADMISSIBLE ESEC SEMPAC SA Hinterbergstrasse 32 CH-6330 CHAM / CH Opponent's representative Kägi, Otto, et al, et al c/o Com Pat AG Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
14.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | ||
02
04.01.1993
03.03.1993
ADMISSIBLE ESEC SEMPAC SA Hinterbergstrasse 32 CH-6330 CHAM / CH Opponent's representative Kägi, Otto Patentanwalt, et al, et al c/o Com Pat AG Gubelstrasse 17 CH-6300 Zug / CH | |||
Former [1995/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
14.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | ||
02
04.01.1993
03.03.1993
ADMISSIBLE ESEC SEMPAC SA Hinterbergstrasse 32 CH-6330 CHAM / CH Opponent's representative Kägi, Otto Patentanwalt, et al, et al St. Jakobstrasse 48 Postfach 201 CH-6330 Cham / CH | |||
Former [1993/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
14.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | ||
02
04.01.1993
03.03.1993
ADMISSIBLE Schablonentechnik Kufstein Ges.m.b.H. Schaftenau, Postfach 26 A- 6330 Kufstein / AT Opponent's representative Kägi, Otto Patentanwalt, et al, et al St. Jakobstrasse 48 Postfach 201 CH-6330 Cham / CH | |||
Former [1993/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
14.01.1993
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | ||
02
04.01.1993
03.03.1993
ADMISSIBLE Schablonentechnik Kufstein Ges.m.b.H. Schaftenau, Postfach 26 A- 6330 Kufstein / AT Opponent's representative Loyer, Bertrand, et al, et al Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1993/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE | ||
02
04.01.1993
Schablonentechnik Kufstein Ges.m.b.H. Schaftenau, Postfach 26 A- 6330 Kufstein / AT Opponent's representative Loyer, Bertrand Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1993/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.12.1992
GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE | 08.03.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.07.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05) | 17.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.10.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.11.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.11.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 01.04.1992 | |
LI | 01.04.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60086850 ; | [A]JP60146383 ; | [A]GB2081974 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG); | [A]FR2520541 (FLONIC SA [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 230 (E-343)[1953], 17 septembre 1985; & JP-A-60 086 850 (DAINIPPON INSATSU K.K.) 16-05-1985, & JP60086850 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 320 (P-413)[2043], 14 décembre 1985; & JP-A-60 146 383 (DAINIPPON INSATSU K.K.) 02-08-1985, & JP60146383 A 00000000 |