EP0278842 - Cladding element to give a vertical wall the appearance of a brick wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 20.06.1990 [1990/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Woestelandt, Xavier Lederzeele F-59143 Watten / FR | For all designated states Woestelandt, Patrice Rue de la Mairie F-59143 Nieurlet / FR | [1988/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Kohn, Philippe, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Kohn, Philippe, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400198.3 | 28.01.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | FR19870001382 | 29.01.1987 Original published format: FR 8701382 | [1988/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0278842 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
E04F13/0864 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [1988/33] | Title | German: | Bekleidungselement, um einer Wand das Aussehen einer Backsteinmauer zu geben | [1988/33] | English: | Cladding element to give a vertical wall the appearance of a brick wall | [1988/33] | French: | Elément de bardage pour la réalisation d'une paroi verticale ayant l'aspect d'un mur en briques | [1988/33] | File destroyed: | 02.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 11.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2247937 (PROST ETS [FR]); | [A]GB1231043 ; | [AD]FR2549879 (WOESTELANDT JOSEPH [FR]); | [A]WO8607402 (ALLIED RESOURCE MANAGEMENT [AU]); | [A]US3015193 (JOSEPH AMORUSO); | [A]US1542882 (HOFFMAN WILLIAM F, et al); | [A]GB2155970 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO); | [A]CH202188 (SCHNEIDER HUGO [DE]) |