EP0282374 - Peptide derivatives with a polycyclic nitrogen structure, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1992 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADIR ET COMPAGNIE 1 rue Carle Hébert 92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ADIR ET COMPAGNIE 1 rue Carle Hébert F-92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states ADIR ET COMPAGNIE 1 rue Carle Hébert F-92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vincent, Michel 8 allée du Prunier Hardy F-92220 Bagneux / FR | 02 /
Remond, Georges 9 avenue des Etats-Unis F-78000 Versailles / FR | 03 /
Cudennec, Claude 23 bis avenue de Circourt F-78170 La Celle St-Cloud / FR | [1988/37] | Application number, filing date | 88400315.3 | 12.02.1988 | [1988/37] | Priority number, date | FR19870001810 | 13.02.1987 Original published format: FR 8701810 | [1988/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282374 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282374 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/08, C07K5/10, A61K37/02 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
C07K5/1024 (EP,US);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K5/0815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/37] | Title | German: | Peptidderivate mit Polyzyklischer Stickstoffstruktur, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und sie enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1988/37] | English: | Peptide derivatives with a polycyclic nitrogen structure, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1988/37] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés peptidiques à structure polycyclique azotée, leur procédé de préparation et les compositions pharmaceutiques qui les contiennent | [1988/37] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 26.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2343034 (HOECHST AG); | [A]FR2453136 (INST ORGANICHESKOGO SINTEZA AK [SU], et al); | [AD]EP0190058 (ADIR [FR]) | Examination | - Int. J. Peptide, Protein Research, 1978, 12, 130-138 |