EP0279747 - Controlling, regulating and monitoring device for a proceeding cold unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/34] | Controlling, regulating and monitoring method for apparatuses and/or rooms for producing cold, and unit producing cold using this method | ||
[1992/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE EUROPEENNE INDUSTRIELLE DU FROID 79 rue du Général Leclerc F-78403 Chatou / FR | [1991/28] |
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states BONNET REFRIGERATION 5, rue Chantecoq F-92808 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubernet, Nicolas THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Frechet, Olivier THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | [1988/34] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Cabinet Hirsch 34 rue de Bassano F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1988/34] | Phan, Chi Quy THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400356.7 | 17.02.1988 | [1988/34] | Priority number, date | FR19870002212 | 20.02.1987 Original published format: FR 8702212 | [1988/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0279747 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0279747 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/24 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
G05D23/1917 (EP);
G05D23/1934 (EP);
G05D23/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1988/34] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Steuerung, Regulierung und Kontrolle eines Kalterzeugungsaggregats | [1992/26] | English: | Controlling, regulating and monitoring device for a proceeding cold unit | [1992/26] | French: | Système de commande, de régulation et de contrôle d'un ensemble de production de froid | [1992/26] |
Former [1988/34] | Verfahren zur Steuerung, Regulierung und Kontrolle von Kalterzeugungsaggregaten und/oder Räumen und Kalterzeugungsaggregat zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | ||
Former [1988/34] | Controlling, regulating and monitoring method for apparatuses and/or rooms for producing cold, and unit producing cold using this method | ||
Former [1988/34] | Procédé de commande, de régulation et de contrôle des appareils et/ou locaux de production de froid, et ensemble de production de froid mettant en oeuvre ce procédé | Examination procedure | 19.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 09.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.06.1992 | BE | 28.02.1993 | LU | 28.02.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1994/09] | NL | 24.06.1992 | |
BE | 28.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/14] | NL | 24.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2521320 ; | [A]EP0003010 ; | [A]US4527247 ; | [A]FR2314455 |