EP0327769 - Novel neuronotrophic factor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIDIA S.p.A. Via Ponte della Fabbrica 3-A 35031 Abano Terme (Padova) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | For all designated states FIDIA S.p.A. Via Ponte della Fabbrica 3-A I-35031 Abano Terme (Padova) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
della Valle, Francesco Via Cerato 14 Padova / IT | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Cabinet Hirsch 34 rue de Bassano F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400365.8 | 17.02.1988 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | IT19880047612 | 08.02.1988 Original published format: IT 4761288 | [1989/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0327769 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0327769 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07K3/02, C07K15/06, A61K37/02 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
C07K14/475 (EP);
A61K35/30 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/33] | Title | German: | Neuronotrophischer Faktor | [1989/33] | English: | Novel neuronotrophic factor | [1989/33] | French: | Facteur neuronotrophique | [1989/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 01.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/45] | 15.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3213963 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]); | [E]EP0258111 (FIDIA SPA [IT]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, vol. 44, Suppl. 1985, page 36, abstract D, R. DAL TOSO et al.: "Purification and characterization of neuronotrophic activity from bovine caudate nucleus" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, vol. 81, November 1984, Biochemistry, pages 6963-6967, D. GOSPODAROWICZ et al.: "Isolation of brain fibroblast growth factor by heparin-Sepharose affinity chromatography: Identity with pituitary fibroblast growth factor" | [AD] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, vol. 83, May 1986, Neurobiology, pages 3012-3016: P. WALICKE et al.: "Fibroblast growth factor promotes survival of dissociated hippocampal neurons and enhance neurite extension" |