EP0281482 - Polymer blends for selective biodegradability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.1991 [1991/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESEARCH TRIANGLE INSTITUTE Office of Research Contracs, 3040 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states RESEARCH TRIANGLE INSTITUTE Office of Research Contracs, 3040 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pitt, Colin G. 2801 Welcome Drive Durham NC 27705 / US | [1988/36] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1988/36] | Application number, filing date | 88400505.9 | 03.03.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | US19870022712 | 06.03.1987 Original published format: US 22712 | [1988/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0281482 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/52, A61K9/70 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
A61L27/58 (EP);
A61K9/1647 (EP);
A61K9/5031 (EP);
A61L17/12 (EP);
A61L27/26 (EP);
C08L67/04 (EP);
G05B2219/32221 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08L67/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/36] | Title | German: | Polymermischungen für die selektive Bioabbaubarkeit | [1988/36] | English: | Polymer blends for selective biodegradability | [1988/36] | French: | Mélanges polymères à biodégradabilité sélective | [1988/36] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 10.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 06.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/46] | 18.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0058481 [ ]; | US4130639 [ ]; | DE2424169 [ ]; | GB2091554 [ ]; | DE2051580 [ ]; | US3867520 [ ]; | EP0138216 [ ] |