EP0286466 - Method for detecting polarization couplings in a double refraction optical system, and its use in assembling components of an optical system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1988/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lefevre, Hervé THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Botti, Serge THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | 03 /
Bettini, Jean-Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Turlèque, Clotilde, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud 92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Turlèque, Clotilde, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400537.2 | 08.03.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | FR19870003459 | 13.03.1987 Original published format: FR 8703459 | [1988/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0286466 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0286466 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0286466 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/00 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
G01M11/331 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Anzeigen von Polarisationskupplungen in einem optischen System mit Doppelbrechung und dessen Anwendung bei der Montage der Komponenten eines optischen Systems | [1988/41] | English: | Method for detecting polarization couplings in a double refraction optical system, and its use in assembling components of an optical system | [1988/41] | French: | Méthode de détection des couplages de polarisation dans un système optique biréfringent, et son application à l'assemblage des composants d'un système optique | [1988/41] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 21.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60147627 ; | [Y]EP0190922 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 320 (P-413)[2043], 14 décembre 1985; & JP-A-60 147 627 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 03-08-1985, & JP60147627 A 00000000 | [Y] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 19, no. 9, 1er mai 1980, pages 1489-1492, New York US; N. SHIBATA et al.: "Spatial technique for measuring modal delay differences in a dual-mode optical fiber" | Examination | - Hecht, E. and Zajac, A.: "Optics", Addison-Wesky Publishing Company, 1974 |