EP0283398 - Electrical switch with a bent actuating handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAEGER 2, rue Baudin F-92303 Levallois-Perret / FR | [1988/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauthier, Christian 47, rue Descartes F-75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
Savary, Jean Michel 1, rue Petit F-92110 Clichy / FR | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400613.1 | 15.03.1988 | [1988/38] | Priority number, date | FR19870003657 | 17.03.1987 Original published format: FR 8703657 | [1988/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0283398 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0283398 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/10, B60R16/00, F16D3/16 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
B60Q1/1476 (EP);
F16D3/16 (EP);
G05G7/02 (EP);
H01H3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1988/38] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Schalter mit einem gebogenen Drehgriff | [1988/38] | English: | Electrical switch with a bent actuating handle | [1988/38] | French: | Commutateur électrique comportant une manette de commande coudée | [1988/38] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 08.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.09.1992 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1156869 ; | [A]US3392548 |