EP0289389 - Position-adjusting apparatus for a chamfering device, and use of this apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1 place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Alain 133 rue Coste F-69300 Caluire / FR | [1988/44] | Representative(s) | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400926.7 | 15.04.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | FR19870005935 | 27.04.1987 Original published format: FR 8705935 | [1988/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0289389 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289389 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q17/22, B23Q9/02, B23B5/16 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
B23Q9/0021 (EP,US);
G21C21/00 (KR);
B23B5/162 (EP,US);
B23Q17/2275 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP);
Y10T409/30644 (EP,US);
Y10T82/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, LI, SE [1988/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Lage eines Senkgerätes und ihre Anwendung | [1988/44] | English: | Position-adjusting apparatus for a chamfering device, and use of this apparatus | [1988/44] | French: | Dispositif de réglage de la position de travail d'une machine d'usinage d'un chanfrein et utilisation de ce dispositif | [1988/44] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 06.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3550488 (ANDERSEN AXEL BRIX); | [A]DE837637 (STIEBLING & CO GEB); | [A]US3477341 (RICKENBRODE GARY H); | [A]US3687007 (HARRIS LEONARD F); | [A]FR2049303 (NARDONE JOSEPH); | [AT]FR2593732 (ROBOTECHNIQUE SARL [FR]); | [A]DE2312786 (SALJE ERNST); | [A]FR2544269 (MALAQUIN JEAN PAUL [FR]); | [A]JPS59129636 (HITACHI LTD) |