EP0291396 - Drying apparatus using micro-waves for the edge of a running web, in particular a textile web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT TEXTILE DE FRANCE 35, rue des Abondances, B.P. 79 92105 Boulogne-Billancourt Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states INSTITUT TEXTILE DE FRANCE 35, rue des Abondances, B.P. 79 F-92105 Boulogne-Billancourt Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Bertrand 4, petite rue des Feuillants F-69001 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Pijew, Alexandre 11, rue Joliot Curie F-69005 Lyon / FR | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 55, rue d'Amsterdam 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | Bertrand, Didier, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 55, rue d'Amsterdam F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401107.3 | 06.05.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | FR19870006574 | 11.05.1987 Original published format: FR 8706574 | [1988/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0291396 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F26B13/00, F26B23/08 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
F26B13/007 (EP,US);
F26B3/347 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [1988/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Trocknung eines Saumes einer Warenbahn durch Mikrowellen, insbesondere Textilmaterial | [1988/46] | English: | Drying apparatus using micro-waves for the edge of a running web, in particular a textile web | [1988/46] | French: | Dispositif de séchage par micro-onde d'une lisière d'un matériau plan en défilement, notamment textile | [1988/46] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 13.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 23.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/09] | 04.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1211789 (CANADIAN PATENTS DEV [CA]); | [A]FR2448699 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]US4149322 (MINODA MINORU, et al) |