EP0294261 - Apparatus for extruding alveolar structural bodies from ceramic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.1990 [1990/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CERAMIQUES ET COMPOSITES Les Miroirs - La Défense 3 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1988/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bilhere-Dieuzede, Charles 2, rue Saint-Jean F-65000-Tarbes / FR | 02 /
Noel, Jacques Résidence Array Dou Sou Pavillon 43 F-65000-Tarbes / FR | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Fabre, Madeleine-France, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie 25 Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Fabre, Madeleine-France, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401193.3 | 18.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | FR19870007038 | 20.05.1987 Original published format: FR 8707038 | [1988/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0294261 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B28B3/26, B28B3/20 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
B28B3/269 (EP);
B28B3/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Extrudieren zelliger Strukturen aus Keramik | [1988/49] | English: | Apparatus for extruding alveolar structural bodies from ceramic | [1988/49] | French: | Dispositif d'extrusion de structures alvéolaires en matériau céramique | [1988/49] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 08.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/04] | 31.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4178145 (HAMAMOTO SHOICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US4259057 (ABE KAZUNOBU, et al); | [Y]EP0027252 (CERAVER [FR]) |