EP0294264 - Locking mechanism for locking a well tool in a well conduit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
GB
NL
Schlumberger Limited 277 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10172 / US | For:FR
IT
SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ELECTRIQUE SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For:DE
GB
NL
SCHLUMBERGER LIMITED 277 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10172 / US | ||
For:FR
IT
SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ELECTRIQUE SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Airey, Peter 30, rue des Vazaniers F-77870 Vulaines sur Seine / FR | 02 /
Doremus, Bernard 3523 Glenn Lakes Missouri City Texas 77459 / US | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Ritzenthaler, Jacques, et al Service Brevets ETUDES ET PRODUCTIONS SCHLUMBERGER BP 202 92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Ritzenthaler, Jacques, et al Service Brevets ETUDES ET PRODUCTIONS SCHLUMBERGER BP 202 F-92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401211.3 | 19.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | FR19870007340 | 25.05.1987 Original published format: FR 8707340 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0294264 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294264 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E21B23/02 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
E21B23/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/49] | Title | German: | Verriegelungsmechanismus zum Verriegeln eines Bohrlochwerkzeugs in einem Förderstrang | [1988/49] | English: | Locking mechanism for locking a well tool in a well conduit | [1988/49] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage pour outil de puits dans une conduite de puits | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 03.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.10.1991 | FR | 28.02.1992 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 09.10.1991 | |
FR | 28.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/34] | FR | 28.02.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4362211 (FISHER JR ERNEST P); | [A]US4554972 (MERRITT DAVID T [US]); | [A]US2605843 (BAKER REUBEN C); | [A]US4469173 (GILBERT BRUCE [US], et al) |