EP0295985 - Identification system for individuals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES MATIERES NUCLEAIRES (COGEMA) 2, rue Paul Dautier B.P. 4 78141 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES MATIERES NUCLEAIRES (COGEMA) 2, rue Paul Dautier B.P. 4 F-78141 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hugelmann, Denis 33, rue des Ardennes F-50100 Cherbourg / FR | 02 /
Ricaud, Jean-Louis 6, Place de L'Eglise d'Huisson Longeville F-91590 La Ferté Allais / FR | 03 /
Roulland, Michel 4, Rue du Vermandois F-50130 Octeville / FR | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1988/51] | Application number, filing date | 88401266.7 | 25.05.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | FR19870007380 | 26.05.1987 Original published format: FR 8707380 | [1988/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0295985 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295985 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, G07F7/10 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G07C9/00 (KR);
G07C9/21 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/35 (EP);
G06K19/073 (EP);
G06K19/07762 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/40975 (EP);
G07C9/215 (EP);
G07C9/27 (EP,KR);
G07C9/28 (EP);
G07F7/082 (EP);
Y04S40/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | System zur Identifizierung von Personen | [1988/51] | English: | Identification system for individuals | [1988/51] | French: | Système d'identification d'individus | [1988/51] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3714644 (HELLSTROM H); | [YD]US3806874 (EHRAT K); | [Y]EP0056686 (HONEYWELL INC [US]); | [A]EP0089087 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]DE3233843 (GALLENSCHUETZ E METALLBAU); | [A]EP0131421 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [Y]FR2571419 (OLLAGNIER ROBERT [FR]); | [A]EP0217654 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]WO8702491 (BLACKWELL VICTOR CAMPBELL [GB]) |