EP0296028 - Polymers with Si-N and Si-Si links, polycarbosilazanes obtained by pyrolysis of these copolymers, and use of the polycarbosilazanes for preparing carbides and nitrides of silicium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1993 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DE PROPULSION (S.E.P.) S.A. 24, rue Salomon de Rothschild 92150 Suresnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DE PROPULSION (S.E.P.) S.A. 24, rue Salomon de Rothschild F-92150 Suresnes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bacque Eric Résidence le Quadrige 90 Rue Robespierre F-33400 Talence / FR | 02 /
Pillot, Jean-Paul 6 Allée de la Sanguine F-33610 Cestas / FR | 03 /
Dunogues, Jacques 22 Avenue du Président Poincaré F-33400 Talence / FR | 04 /
Olry, Pierre 27 Rue Edmond Costedoat F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Combe, André, et al CABINET BEAU DE LOMENIE 55, rue d'Amsterdam 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | Combe, André, et al CABINET BEAU DE LOMENIE 55, rue d'Amsterdam F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401401.0 | 09.06.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | FR19870008091 | 10.06.1987 Original published format: FR 8708091 | [1988/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0296028 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0296028 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/60, C04B35/00 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
C08G77/60 (EP,US);
C08G77/04 (KR);
C04B35/571 (EP,US);
C04B35/589 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | Kopolymere mit Si-N und Si-Si-Bindungen, Polycarbosilane aus der Pyrolyse dieser Kopolymere und deren Verwendung zur Herstellung von Carbiden und Nitriden von Silizium | [1988/51] | English: | Polymers with Si-N and Si-Si links, polycarbosilazanes obtained by pyrolysis of these copolymers, and use of the polycarbosilazanes for preparing carbides and nitrides of silicium | [1988/51] | French: | Copolymères à liaisons Si-N et Si-Si, polycarbosilazanes obtenus par pyrolyse desdits copolymères et utilisation desdits polycarbosilazanes pour la préparation de carbonitrure de silicium | [1988/51] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 16.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/25] | 29.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0161751 (DOW CORNING [US]); | [A]EP0208972 (PETRARCH SYSTEMS INC [US]) |