EP0295186 - Boundary-free semiconductor memory device having a plurality of slide access memories [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1995 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuda, Yusuke 1070, Shimokodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Ogawa, Junji 14-1-405, Sugekitaura 4-chome Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 214 / JP | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401439.0 | 10.06.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | JP19870143254 | 10.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14325487 | [1988/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0295186 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0295186 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295186 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11C8/00, G11C11/24 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
G11C8/12 (EP,US);
G11C7/00 (KR);
G06T1/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/50] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicheranordnung ohne Begrenzung mit einer Vielheit von Schubladespeichern | [1988/50] | English: | Boundary-free semiconductor memory device having a plurality of slide access memories | [1988/50] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteurs sans limites comprenant une pluralité de mémoires à tiroir | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 17.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 25.11.1994 | [1995/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58001872 ; | [Y]GB2092785 (RCA CORP); | [Y]US4561072 (ARAKAWA TAKESHI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7. no. 70 (P-185), 23rd March 1983; & JP-A-58 001 872 (FUJITSU K.K.) 07-01-1983, & JP58001872 A 00000000 |