EP0297951 - Control device and method for a spark ignition engine starting from the statistical distribution of an angular deviation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lefèbvre, Claude 61, avenue de Tobrouk F-78500 Sartrouville / FR | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1990/36] |
Former [1989/01] | Aubel, Pierre, et al Institut Français du Pétrole Département Brevets 4, avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401554.6 | 21.06.1988 | [1989/01] | Priority number, date | FR19870009264 | 30.06.1987 Original published format: FR 8709264 | [1989/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0297951 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0297951 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F02D35/02, F02D41/14, F02P17/00 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
F02P17/12 (EP,US);
F02D35/021 (EP,US);
F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
F02P5/045 (EP,US);
F02P5/1455 (EP,US);
F02P5/1512 (EP,US);
F02P5/1516 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US);
F02P2017/125 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung der Fremdzündung einer Kraftmaschine ausgehend von der statistischen Verteilung eines winkligen Abstandes | [1989/01] | English: | Control device and method for a spark ignition engine starting from the statistical distribution of an angular deviation | [1989/01] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de réglage d'un moteur à allumage commandé à partir de la distribution statistique d'un écart angulaire | [1989/01] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 18.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 08.11.1989 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | 05.02.1991 | Resumption of proceedings |
Former [1993/17] | DE | 03.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6125951 ; | [X]GB2105408 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [X]US4519366 (MAY MICHAEL G [CH]); | [A]US4561397 (TSUKAMOTO KEISUKE [JP], et al); | [A]US4562818 (KOHAMA TOKIO [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 176 (M-491)[2232], 20 juin 1986, page 90 M 491; & JP-A-61 25 951 (KYUSHU DENKI SEIZO K.K.) 05-02-1986, & JP6125951 A 00000000 |