EP0297995 - Polycyclic aromatic compounds, process for their preparation and their use in human and animal medicine and in cosmetics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maignan, Jean 8, rue Halévy F-93290 Tremblay Les Gonesse / FR | 02 /
Lang, Gérard 44, avenue Lacour F-95210 St Gratien / FR | 03 /
Malle, Gérard 18, Grande Rue F-77580 Villiers Sur Morin / FR | 04 /
Restle, Serge 140, rue Anatole France F-93600 Aulnay-Sous-Bois / FR | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard, et al CABINET NONY & CIE 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401715.3 | 01.07.1988 | [1989/01] | Priority number, date | FR19870009478 | 03.07.1987 Original published format: FR 8709478 | [1989/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0297995 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0297995 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C309/28, C07C309/72, C07C311/15, C07C317/14, C07C321/28, C07C323/00, C07C311/29, A61K31/10, A61K7/48 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
A61Q5/008 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
C07C317/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1989/01] | C07C147/10, C07C147/06, C07C149/32, C07C147/14, C07C149/36, C07C149/31, C07C143/80, A61K31/10, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/01] | Title | German: | Polyzyklische aromatische Verbindungen, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, deren Verwendung in menschlicher und tierischer Medizin und in der Kosmetik | [1989/01] | English: | Polycyclic aromatic compounds, process for their preparation and their use in human and animal medicine and in cosmetics | [1989/01] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés polycycliques aromatiques, leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation en médecine humaine et vétérinaire et en cosmétique | [1989/01] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 05.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2164644 (OREAL); | [A]GB2164938 (OREAL) |